MS HB1092 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-7-62, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish Standards Regarding The Installation Of Automobile Airbags And Supplemental Restraint Systems; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Automobile airbags and supplemental restraint systems; establish standards for installation of.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred To Business and Commerce |