MS HB1685 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Covington County, Mississippi, To Use Its Industrial Park Land And Buildings For The Location And Construction Of A County Jail; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Covington County; authorize to use industrial park land for the construction of a county jail.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-29 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-29 | Passed | |
2012-04-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-27 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-27 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-27 | Passed | |
2012-04-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-20 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |