MS HB1704 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 7 Of Chapter 15, Laws Of 2023, To Revise The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriation To The Board Of Psychology To Revise The Amount Of Funds Provided For The Administrative Support Of The Mississippi Autism Board; To Amend Section 4 Of Chapter 34, Laws Of 2023, To Revise The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriation To The Office Of State Aid Road Construction To Revise The Amount Of Funds Authorized To Be Expended For The Replacement Of Structurally Deficient Bridges; To Amend Section 41 Of Chapter 98, Laws Of 2023, To Revise The 2024 Fiscal Year Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning To Revise The Purposes For Which Alcorn State University May Incur Expenses Related To Making Improvements To The Davey L. Whitney Complex And Wellness Center; To Amend Sections 1, 2 And 18 Of Chapter 53, Laws Of 2023, To Amend The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriation To The Mississippi Department Of Insurance To Revise The Maximum Amounts Of General And Special Funds So That The Mississippi Length Of Service Award Program Will Be Funded With Special Funds; To Amend Section 40 Of Chapter 91, Laws Of 2023, To Revise The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriation To The State Department Of Health To Clarify The Period For Which Expenditures May Be Made For Reimbursement Of Expenses For Severe Weather Storm Damage; To Amend Sections 1, 2 And 45 Of Chapter 108, Laws Of 2023, To Amend The Fiscal Year 2024 Appropriation To The State Department Of Education To Revise The Maximum Amounts Of General And Special Funds To Change The Funding Sources For The Charter School Authorizer Board; To Amend Section 27-103-204.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Treasurer To Escalate His Or Her Budget And Expend The Amount Of Any Funds Borrowed From The Working Cash-stabilization Reserve Fund To Offset Any Temporary Cash Flow Deficiencies In The Gf Obligations Fund; To Amend Section 37-21-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Funds Appropriated For The Early Learning Collaborative Act Of 2013 Remaining After Awards To Early Learning Collaboratives And The Department's Administrative Needs Are Met May Be Carried Over In The Following Year; To Amend Section 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Education Enhancement Funds Appropriated For Classroom Supplies, Instructional Materials And Equipment For Teachers That Are Unexpended Will Be Carried Forward, Combined With The Following Year's Allocation Of Education Enhancement Fund Instructional Supplies Funds And Reallocated For The Following Year; To Amend Section 49-39-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize State Agencies Receiving Funds From The Mississippi Outdoor Stewardship Trust Fund To Escalate Their Budgets And Expend Such Funds; To Direct The State Treasurer And State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Certain Amounts From And To Certain Funds In The State Treasury; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriations; revise certain FY 2024 appropriations and direct transfers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 103 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 21 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 61 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 39 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |