MS HB1720 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 1016, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Last Amended By Chapter 908, Local And Private Laws Of 2020, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2024, To July 1, 2028, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pontotoc To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels, Motels And Restaurants For The Promotion Of Tourism And Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Pontotoc; extend repealer on authority to levy tax on hotels, motels and restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Steverson, Barnett, Hines) |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |