MS HB43 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-1.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Wildlife In Mississippi Belongs To The Citizens Of The State At Large; To Provide That The State Has A Duty To Protect And Sustain Its Wildlife For The Public's Benefit, As Well As The Duty And Authority To Defend The Public's Interest In The State's Wildlife, In Accordance With Sound Scientific Principles; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Wildlife; provide that the state has a duty to protect and sustain for the public's benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2024-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed |
2024-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |