MS HB580 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Require Its Contractors To Provide Work Zone Safety Operations; To Authorize The Commission's Contractors To Enter Into Agreements With State And Local Law Enforcement Agencies To Provide Work Zone Safety Operations; To Authorize The Commission To Utilize Its Officers To Perform Certain Work Zone Safety Operation Functions; To Amend Section 63-3-516, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide New Criminal Penalties For Highway Work Zone Violations That Result In Property Damage Or Serious Bodily Injury Or Death; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Transportation Commission; authorize to require its contractors to provide work zone safety operations.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Stacey Hobgood-Wilkes [R] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Transportation |