MS HB986 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Trucking Association Foundation, Inc.; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Persons Who Are Members Of Wahabi Shrine Temple In Mississippi, Joppa Shrine Temple In Mississippi And Hamasa Shrine Temple In Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Mississippi Emergency Services Association, Llc; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Damage Prevention Council; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Swimming Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Northwest Rankin High School Athletics; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Southern Pines Animal Shelter; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Big Brothers Big Sisters Of Mississippi, Inc; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Dental Hygienists' Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Kossuth High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Phi Kappa Tau Fraternity; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Corinth High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Golf Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Alcorn Central High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Tuskegee Airmen; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Biggersville High School; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Sisters With A Throttle Motorcycle Club; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Section 27-19-56.47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Aircraft Pilots; To Amend Section 27-19-56.172, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Academy Of Family Physicians Foundation; To Amend Section 27-19-56.281, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Distribution Of Fees Collected From The Issuance Of Distinctive License Tags To Supporters Of Lanier High School To Provide That A Portion Of The Fees Will Be Distributed To The Lanier High School National Alumni Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Law Enforcement Officers' Association; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Section 27-19-44, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Such Distinctive License Tag Authorized Shall Be Exempt From The Requirement That Proof Must Be Submitted To The Department Of Revenue That A Certain Number Of The Tags Will Be Purchased And That The Amount Necessary To Purchase Such Tags Must Be Deposited With The Department Within Three Years After The Effective Date Of The Law Authorizing The Tag Before The Tag May Be Produced; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mind Center At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Section 27-19-56.111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Mississippi Emergency Medical Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive license tag; authorize for various purposes .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Died In Conference | |
2012-04-28 | Conferees Named Fillingane,Flowers,Massey | |
2012-04-20 | Conferees Named Zuber,Brown (20th),Turner | |
2012-04-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-04 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Ways and Means |