MS HC112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Ministerial Service, Leadership And Spiritual Merit Of Rials Creek United Methodist Church On The Occasion Of Its 150th Anniversary Homecoming Celebration On May 30, 2010.
Title
Rials Creek United Methodist Church; congratulate upon 150 years of service and ministry.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Gipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-22 | Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Rules |