MS HC40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Coach Hugh Freeze Upon His Hiring As The Head Coach Of The University Of Mississippi Rebels Football Team.
Title
Hugh Freeze; commend and congratulate upon being named Ole Miss Head Coach of Football.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Donnie Bell [R] | Rep. Cecil Brown [D] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Rep. Charles Busby [R] | Rep. Bob Evans [D] | Rep. Stephen Holland [D] | Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Brad Mayo [R] | Rep. Kevin McGee [R] | Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R] |
Rep. Bobby Moak [D] | Rep. Pat Nelson [R] | Rep. Randall Patterson [R] | Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Margaret Rogers [R] | Rep. Bobby Shows [R] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Jason White [R] |
Rep. Tommy Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-29 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-29 | Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-02-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Rules |