MS HC72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Carrie Jones For Her Many Historic Contributions To The Sport Of Golf And Recognizing March 21, 2012, As Carrie Jones Golf Day.
Title
Carrie Jones Golf Day; recognize March 21, 2012, as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Title Suff Adopted Comm Sub | |
2012-02-29 | Recommitted to Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Rules |