MS SB2302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-43-3.103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That Specific Notice Of Proposed Rule Adoption Be Given To The Legislature By State Agencies And The Mississippi Capitol Region Utility Authority Using Electronic Means; To Amend Section 25-43-3.111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State agencies; notify Legislature of proposed rule adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |