MS SB2570 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-104-7 And 37-153-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Time Period Of The Exemption For The Office Of Workforce Development From Certain Public Procurement Review Board Provisions Related To Rental Agreements Or Leasing Of Real Property For The Purpose Of Conducting Agency Business; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Office of Workforce Development; extend exemption from PPRB provisions on rental/leasing of real property for agency business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2024-04-17 | House | Conferees Named Bell (21st),Anthony,Haney |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Sparks,Robinson,Suber |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | Amended |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 104 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 153 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |