MS SB2651 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Business Entities Providing Credit Card Processing Hardware Or Software To Retail Merchants To Provide Such Hardware Or Software That Meets The Requirements Of Federal Law; To Provide Penalties For Violations Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Credit card processing hardware or software; shall meet federal law requirements when provided to retail merchants.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-02-19 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-02-18 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-18 | Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Banking and Financial Services | |
2010-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |