MS SB2761 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Commission On School District Efficiency Within The State Department Of Education And Require Annual Reports To The Governor And The Legislature Relative To Business Efficiency Standards For Accreditation; To Amend Sections 37-7-301, 37-61-33 And 31-7-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Adopt Purchasing Regulations Regarding The Use Of Procurement Cards By School Districts And Teacher Supply Funds And To Issue Procurement Cards To Teachers On An Annual Basis For The Purchase Of Said Instructional Materials; To Amend Section 37-151-103 And 37-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Payroll Date For School Districts; To Amend Section 37-7-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Use Of Donated Leave By School District Personnel; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School District Procurement Efficiency Commission; continue under State Department of Education and authorize procurement cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-26 | Conferees Named Moore,Holloway,Clarke | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Tollison,Hopson,Harden | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-11 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-10 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-03 | DR - TSDP: AP To ED | |
2012-03-28 | DR - TSDP: ED To AP | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Education;Appropriations | |
2012-03-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-14 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-02 | DR - TSDP: AC To ED | |
2012-02-28 | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AC | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Education;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |