MS SB2989 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Special Funds For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Examiners For Licensed Professional Counselors For Fiscal Year 2013.
Title
Appropriation; Counselors, Board of Examiners for Licensed Professional.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Phillip Gandy [R] |
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Frierson,Huddleston (15th),Jennings | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Clarke,Jackson (32nd),Horhn | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-13 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-26 | Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Appropriations |