MS SC661 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating France Phillips Beard As Miss Mississippi's Outstanding Teen 2011.
Title
Commend France Phillips Beard as Miss Mississippi's Outstanding Teen 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-27 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-27 | Adopted | |
2012-04-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-25 | Adopted | |
2012-04-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-19 | Referred To Rules |