MT HB303 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Implement Medical Ethics and Diversity Act
Title
Implement Medical Ethics and Diversity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Regier [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 39 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 39 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-03 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2023-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-21 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2023-04-14 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-04-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-02-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-07 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-02-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2023-02-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-06 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | House | (H) Motion Carried |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-01-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-21 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |