MT HB5 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Long-range building appropriations -- include energy conservation
Title
Long-range building appropriations -- include energy conservation
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sesso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-30 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference committee Report Adopted on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received   | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed   | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed   | |
2009-04-17 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred   | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-04-01 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-26 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-03-25 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-24 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning | |
2009-01-05 | (H) First Reading   | |
2008-12-19 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2008-12-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-18 | (H) Introduced   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-12-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-07-30 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-06-24 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=5&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |