MT SB184 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise procedural requirements in child abuse and neglect proceedings
Title
Revise procedural requirements in child abuse and neglect proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-06-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-06-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-06-20 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-06-14 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-06-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-06-10 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-06-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-06-09 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Returned to Senate Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-07 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2023-04-06 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-11 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-10-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |