MT SJ23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study on allowing public notice via certain electronic publications
Title
Interim study on allowing public notice via certain electronic publications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-05-02 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-05-02 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-04-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-04-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-03-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2021-03-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-02-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-09-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-08-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2019-12-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Cities and Towns
Communications
Counties
Documents
Legislature, Interim Studies
Local Government
Public Contracts
Public Officers and Employees
State Government
Communications
Counties
Documents
Legislature, Interim Studies
Local Government
Public Contracts
Public Officers and Employees
State Government