NC H1031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Ed. Funding Dispute Process
Title
Local Ed. Funding Dispute Process
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-83 | |
2018-06-25 | Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018 | |
2018-06-15 | Ratified | |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-13 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-11 | House | Serial Referral To State and Local Government II Stricken |
2018-05-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Filed |