NC H169 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restore State Claim for Wrongful Discharge
Title
Restore State Claim for Wrongful Discharge
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hager [R] | Rep. Larry Bell [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A1 Adams Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-07-21 - House - M8 Re-Refer Environment Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-07-01 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A1 Adams Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-07-21 - House - M8 Re-Refer Environment Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Ch. SL 2016-99 | |
2016-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-07-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2016-07-01 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2016-07-01 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conferees Reappointed |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2016-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-14 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/31/2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-07-21 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-21 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-07-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-03-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |