NC H274 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-550
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-550
Summary
Clarifying Changes to State Law.
Title
Clarifying Changes to State Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-550 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-10 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted #4 | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted #3 | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-24 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Cal For 3/19/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-12 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-03-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-25 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-02-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S285 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Insurance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H274 |