NC H355 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Firefighters' Death Benefits/Cancers
Title
Firefighters' Death Benefits/Cancers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S356 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate