NC H355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighting Foam Registry/PFAS Ban
Title
Firefighting Foam Registry/PFAS Ban
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken |
2021-04-14 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-04-14 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2021-04-14 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S327 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Chapel Hill
Colleges & Universities
Data & Records Systems
Education
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Fire Marshall
Firefighters & Firefighting
Hazardous Substances
Higher Education
Information Technology
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Policy Collaboratory
Public
Records
Reporting
Title Change
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Boards
Budgeting
Chapel Hill
Colleges & Universities
Data & Records Systems
Education
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Fire Marshall
Firefighters & Firefighting
Hazardous Substances
Higher Education
Information Technology
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Policy Collaboratory
Public
Records
Reporting
Title Change
Unc
Unc Board Of Governors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 215.104LL | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 215.104MM | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 82B-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 82B-10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 82B-15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 82B-5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |