NC H358 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement Technical Corrections.-AB
Title
Retirement Technical Corrections.-AB
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] |
Rep. Larry Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-288 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2013 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Postponed To 05/08/2013 |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-23 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed |