NC H462 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contingency Contracts For Audits/Assessments
Title
Contingency Contracts For Audits/Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 4\Motion 7\To Reconsider (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 4\Motion 7\To Reconsider (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-152 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-03 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2012-06-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2012-06-20 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-20 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-19 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Amend Failed 4 | |
2012-06-19 | Amend Recon 4 | |
2012-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/12/2012 | |
2012-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-03-28 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-03-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Filed |