NC H483 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land-Use Regulatory Changes
Title
Land-Use Regulatory Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Ch. SL 2016-111 | |
2016-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Commerce |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |