NC H519 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Pied. Triad Water Auth./Control Fishing
Title
Pied. Triad Water Auth./Control Fishing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-19 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-30 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Filed |