NC H667 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-539
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-539
Summary
2009 Viticulture/Enology Act.
Title
2009 Viticulture/Enology Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. Pryor Gibson [D] | Rep. Melanie Goodwin [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Darrell McCormick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-539 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-07-20 | Ref To Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2009-07-20 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-07-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-19 | Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H667 |