NC H676 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-44
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-44
Summary
Law Enforcement Jurisdiction in Iredell Co.
Title
Law Enforcement Jurisdiction in Iredell Co.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Ch. SL 2009-44 | |
2009-05-28 | Ratified | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-16 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-16 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Placed On Cal For 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Without Prejudice | |
2009-03-19 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H676 |