NC H679 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-16 - Ch. SL 2011-417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-16 - Ch. SL 2011-417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wake Superior Court Curative
Title
Wake Superior Court Curative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-11-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-11-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Ch. SL 2011-417 | |
2011-11-16 | Signed By Gov. 11/16/2011 | |
2011-11-08 | Pres. To Gov. 11/8/2011 | |
2011-11-07 | Ratified | |
2011-11-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-11-07 | Placed On Cal For 11/7/2011 | |
2011-11-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-11-07 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2011-11-07 | Rec From House | |
2011-11-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-11-07 | Placed On Cal For 11/7/2011 | |
2011-11-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-11-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-11-07 | Re-ref Com On Redistricting | |
2011-11-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-13 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S524 (Same As) 2011-05-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance