NC S524 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthening Residential Placement
Title
Strengthening Residential Placement
Sponsors
Sen. Harris Blake [R] | Sen. James Forrester [R] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Sen. Neal Hunt [R] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. David Rouzer [R] |
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Mental Health & Youth Services | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H679 (Same As) 2011-11-16 - Ch. SL 2011-417