NC H792 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gfeller-Waller Concussion Awareness Act
Title
Gfeller-Waller Concussion Awareness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Ch. SL 2011-147 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed By Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Ratified | |
2011-06-09 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-04 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Postponed To 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed On Cal For 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |