NC H944 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DCR and DENR/Study State Attractions Savings
Title
DCR and DENR/Study State Attractions Savings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-30 | Re-ref Com On Government | |
2012-05-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S813 (Same As) 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-93