NC S813 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DCR and DENR/Study State Attractions Savings
Title
DCR and DENR/Study State Attractions Savings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Ch. SL 2012-93 | |
2012-06-28 | Signed By Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/12/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-11 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H944 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - Ref To Com On Finance