NC S1007 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-509
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-509
Summary
Amend Home Inspector Licensure Laws.
Title
Amend Home Inspector Licensure Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-509 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-10 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-12 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-11 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H979 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1007 |