NC S108 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-26 - Re-ref Com On Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-26 - Re-ref Com On Ways & Means
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Summary
Management of the Striped Bass Fishery.
Title
Management of the Striped Bass Fishery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-26 | Re-ref Com On Ways & Means | |
2009-02-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-11 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H107 (Same As) 2011-02-16 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S108 |