NC S59 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Even Yr Elections/Maysville & Pollocksville
Title
Even Yr Elections/Maysville & Pollocksville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H152 (Same As) 2023-03-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Jones County
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Maysville
Municipalities
Pollocksville
Public Officials
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Jones County
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Maysville
Municipalities
Pollocksville
Public Officials