NC S673 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural Gas Econ. Dev. Infrastructure
Title
Natural Gas Econ. Dev. Infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | Ch. SL 2016-118 | |
2016-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-22 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2015-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H800 (Same As) 2015-08-11 - Ch. SL 2015-209