NC S749 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-561
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-561
Summary
Revise UM/UIM Liability Coverage Requirements.
Title
Revise UM/UIM Liability Coverage Requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-561 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-23 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S749 |