NC S951 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer Certain Correctional Facilities
Title
Transfer Certain Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A2 Haire\Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading\M6 Reconsider (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading\M3 To Lay On T\able/Reconside\r (Y: 48 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 86 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A2 Haire\Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading\M6 Reconsider (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading\M3 To Lay On T\able/Reconside\r (Y: 48 N: 64 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 86 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-177 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Postponed To 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Reconsidered 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Failed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-21 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-31 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Filed |