ND HB1008 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of financial institutions; to provide an exemption; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of financial institutions; to provide an exemption; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 |
2023-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor 05/04 |
2023-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5 |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Roers Erbele Vedaa |
2023-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Meier Pyle Monson |
2023-04-07 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 2 3 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |