ND HB1011 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach Wanzek O'Connell | |
2011-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 19 | |
2011-02-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 8 0 | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-20 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |