ND HB1126 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-51.1-07.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of oil and gas gross production tax and oil extraction tax revenues.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-51.1-07.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of oil and gas gross production tax and oil extraction tax revenues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-25 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 041 nays 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-01-22 | Received from House | |
2009-01-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1126.html |