ND HB1137 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an individual income tax credit for charitable contributions; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An individual income tax credit for charitable contributions; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Bob Martinson [R] | Rep. Dave Nehring [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] |
Sen. Jim Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 2 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 14 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 2 0 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |