ND HB1141 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-13-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to towing an individual on water skis or similar devices.
Title
Towing an individual on water skis or similar devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 9 |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |