ND HB1148 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-10.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electric bicycle regulations, manufacturing, and operations; to amend and reenact sections 39-01-01, 39-05-02.2, and 39-10.1-08, subsection 5 of section 39-16-01, subsection 2 of section 39-29-01, and subsection 2 of section 57-40.3-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the requirements for electric bicycles distributed, manufactured, and operated in the state; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The requirements for electric bicycles distributed, manufactured, and operated in the state; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Greg Westlind [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 1 |
2021-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dwyer Fors Conley |
2021-04-05 | House | Appoint Rep. Becker to replace Rep. Paur on conference committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Conference committee appointed Paur Christensen Hanson |
2021-04-01 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 9 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |