ND HB1153 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 26.1-17-33.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restructuring of nonprofit mutual insurance companies; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Restructuring of nonprofit mutual insurance companies; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Tony Grindberg [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor 04/03 |
2013-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-25 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |