ND HB1154 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-07-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a bicycle and a ridden animal being deemed a vehicle.
Title
A bicycle and a ridden animal being deemed a vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 26 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |